MS SC593 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Lewisburg High School "patriots" Baseball Team And Coach Rusty Cagle For Winning Their First Mhsaa Class 4a State Championship.
Title
Commend Lewisburg High School "Patriots" Baseball Team for winning first MHSAA Class 4A State Championship.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Massey [R] | Sen. Nickey Browning [R] | Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Joey Fillingane [R] |
Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. Perry Lee [R] | Sen. David Parker [R] | Sen. Bill Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-14 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-14 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2014-03-14 | House | Immediate Release |
2014-03-14 | House | Adopted |
2014-03-13 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-03-10 | House | Referred To Rules |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Adopted |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Referred To Rules |