MS SC593 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The H.w. Byers High School "lady Lions" Girls Basketball Team And Coach Jason Thompson For Winning Their Third Consecutive Mhsaa Class 1a State Championship.
Title
Commend H.W. Byers High School "Lady Lions" Basketball Team for 3-peat Class 1A State Championship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-19 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-19 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-03-19 | House | Immediate Release |
2013-03-19 | House | Adopted |
2013-03-18 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred To Rules |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Adopted |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Referred To Rules |