MS SC592 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Florence High School Lady Eagles Soccer Team And Head Coach Gray Massey For Their Outstanding 2011-2012 Season And For Winning The Mississippi High School Activities Association Class 4a State Championship.
Title
Commend and congratulate Florence High School Lady Eagles Soccer Team on winning 2012 Class 4A Title.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-20 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-03-21 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-03-20 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-03-20 | Immediate Release | |
2012-03-20 | Adopted | |
2012-03-19 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-03-16 | Referred To Rules | |
2012-03-16 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-03-16 | Immediate Release | |
2012-03-16 | Adopted | |
2012-03-15 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | Referred To Rules |