MS SC591 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing The Dedicated Public Service Of Firefighter Instructor Reggie Bell, Executive Director Of The Mississippi State Fire Academy In Pearl, Mississippi, On The Occasion Of His Retirement.
Title
Recognize service of Reggie Bell, Executive Director of the Mississippi State Fire Academy, on his retirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - House - House Adopted (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-04 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-04 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-03-04 | House | Adopted |
2019-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred To Rules |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Referred To Rules |