MS SC590 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating Lauren O. Pickett On Being Selected As The 2014 State Games Of Mississippi At&t Female Athlete Of The Year.
Title
Commend Lauren O. Pickett upon being selected the 2014 State Games AT&T Female Athlete of the Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-05 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-05 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2015-03-05 | House | Immediate Release |
2015-03-05 | House | Adopted |
2015-03-04 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred To Rules |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Referred To Rules |