MS SC586 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Designating April 14, 2022, As "reman Day" In Mississippi.
Title
Designate April 14, 2022, as "Reman Day" in Mississippi.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-28 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-03-28 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-03-28 | House | Adopted |
2022-03-28 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-03-26 | House | Referred To Rules |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Adopted |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Referred To Rules |