MS SC577 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-28 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-28 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Declaring The Month Of October 2020 As Metastatic Breast Cancer Awareness Month.
Title
Declare the month of October as Metastatic Breast Cancer Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Kirby [R] | Sen. Kevin Blackwell [R] | Sen. Jennifer Branning [R] | Sen. Chris McDaniel [R] |
Sen. Joseph Seymour [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - House - House Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-28 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-26 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-06-26 | House | Immediate Release |
2020-06-26 | House | Adopted |
2020-06-24 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-06-23 | House | Referred To Rules |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Adopted |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Referred To Rules |