MS SC577 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-14 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-14 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating Jim Mcingvale, Director Of Communications And Public Affairs At Ingalls Shipbuilding In Pascagoula, Mississippi, As 2016-2017 Chairman Of The Mississippi Manufacturers Association.
Title
Recognize Jim McIngvale, Director of Communications for Ingalls, as new Chairman of MMA.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-03 - House - House Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-14 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-02-03 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-02-03 | House | Immediate Release |
2017-02-03 | House | Adopted |
2017-02-02 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-26 | House | Referred To Rules |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred To Rules |