MS SC576 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on February 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-14 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on February 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-14 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Paying Tribute And Recognition To The Memory Of Noted Mississippi Attorney And Civic Leader Honorable Jerome "jerry" Hafter Of Greenville, Mississippi, And Extend The Condolences Of The Mississippi Legislature To His Bereaved Family.
Title
Pay tribute to the memory of noted Mississippi Attorney and Civic Leader Jerry Hafter.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-03 - House - House Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-14 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-02-03 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-02-03 | House | Immediate Release |
2017-02-03 | House | Adopted |
2017-02-02 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-26 | House | Referred To Rules |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred To Rules |