MS SC573 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Extending The Condolences Of The Legislature To The Surviving Family Of Robert Jerry "gentle Ben" Williams Of Yazoo City, Mississippi, The First African American To Play Football At The University Of Mississippi And One Of The Greatest Defensive Players In The School's History, And Commending His Civic Contributions.
Title
Commend the life of Robert Jerry "Gentle Ben" Williams, the first African American to play football at Ole Miss.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Thomas [D] | Sen. Walter Michel [R] | Sen. David Jordan [D] | Sen. David Blount [D] |
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Sollie Norwood [D] | Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-23 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-23 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-06-23 | House | Immediate Release |
2020-06-23 | House | Adopted |
2020-06-18 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-06-16 | House | Referred To Rules |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Adopted |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Referred To Rules |