MS SC573 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Extending The Sympathy Of The Mississippi Legislature To The Bereaved Family Of Laurel Police Department Chief Of Police Tyrone Stewart And Commending His Law Enforcement Service.
Title
Extend sympathy of Legislature to family of Laurel Police Chief Tyrone Stewart.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - House - House Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-02-12 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-02-12 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-02-12 | House | Adopted |
2019-02-12 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred To Rules |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred To Rules |