MS SC573 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing Mississippi Author Thomas E. Simmons And The Legacy Of Colonel John Charles Robinson Of Gulfport, Mississippi, Who Is The Subject Of His Book The Man Called Brown Condor: The Forgotten History Of An African American Fighter Pilot.
Title
Recognize Mississippi Author Thomas E. Simmons and his book about African-American Fighter Pilot John Charles Robinson.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-19 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-19 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-03-19 | House | Immediate Release |
2013-03-19 | House | Adopted |
2013-03-18 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred To Rules |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Adopted |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred To Rules |