MS SC568 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on February 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-18 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on February 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-18 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Paying Tribute To The Mental Health Career And Legacy Of Steve Roark For Four Decades Of Leadership To The Warren-yazoo Mental Health Service.
Title
Commend leadership and legacy of Steve Roark at Warren-Yazoo Mental Health Service.
Sponsors
Sen. Kenneth Jones [D] | Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Eugene Clarke [R] | Sen. Joey Fillingane [R] |
Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] | Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-17 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-02-17 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2015-02-17 | House | Immediate Release |
2015-02-17 | House | Adopted |
2015-02-16 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-02-16 | House | Referred To Rules |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Referred To Rules |