MS SC563 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-9)
Status: Passed on March 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-9)
Status: Passed on March 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution To Condemn The Invasion Of Ukraine And To Sever All Economic, Financial, And Other Connections With The Russian Federation, Its Leaders, And Its Businesses.
Title
Condemn the invasion of Ukraine and sever all connections with the Russian Federation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - House - House Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Adopted As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Adopted As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-24 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-03-24 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-03-24 | House | Adopted |
2022-03-22 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-03-17 | House | Referred To Rules |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Adopted As Amended |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Amended |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred To Rules |