MS SC563 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing The Career Accomplishments And Civic Contributions Of Tom Pittman, President And Ceo Of The Community Foundation Of Northwest Mississippi, On The Occasion Of His Retirement And Extending The Best Wishes Of The Legislature.
Title
Recognize career and civic contributions of Tom Pittman, President and CEO of Community Foundation of Northwest Mississippi.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-23 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-23 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-06-23 | House | Immediate Release |
2020-06-23 | House | Adopted |
2020-06-18 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-06-16 | House | Referred To Rules |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Adopted |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referred To Rules |