MS SC562 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-4)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-4)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Nation Of Israel For Its Cordial And Mutually Beneficial Relationship With The United States And With The State Of Mississippi.
Title
Commend Israel on relationship with United States and Mississippi.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-19 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-19 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-03-19 | House | Immediate Release |
2013-03-19 | House | Adopted |
2013-03-18 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred To Rules |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Adopted |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Amendment Failed |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Reconsidered |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Recalled From House |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Adopted |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred To Rules |