MS SC561 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing And Saluting The Turquoise Council Of Americans And Eurasians And The Mississippi-turkish Hospitality Leadership Network And Welcoming The Foreign Dignitaries From Azerbaijan To Mississippi.
Title
Recognize mission of Turquoise Council of Americans and Eurasians and welcome dignitaries from Azerbaijan to Mississippi.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-28 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-02-29 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-02-28 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-02-28 | Immediate Release | |
2012-02-28 | Adopted | |
2012-02-23 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-02-20 | Referred To Rules | |
2012-02-20 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-02-16 | Adopted | |
2012-02-15 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-02-15 | Referred To Rules |