MS SC558 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating Dia Chawla Of Pillow Academy In Greenwood As The Second Mississippi High School Student To Win The National High School Heisman Trophy, Given To The Top High School Student Athlete In The United States Of America.
Title
Commend Dia Chawla of Pillow Academy in Greenwood for winning National High School Heisman Trophy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - House Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-08 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-03-08 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-03-08 | House | Adopted |
2022-03-07 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-03-02 | House | Referred To Rules |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Adopted |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Rules |