MS SC555 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Extending The Recognition Of The Mississippi Legislature To The Canton Spirituals As Recipients Of The 2019 Governor's Arts Award For Lifetime Achievement.
Title
Recognize the Canton Spirituals as recipients of the 2019 Governor's Arts Award for Lifetime Achievement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-05 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-02-05 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-02-05 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-02-05 | House | Adopted |
2019-02-05 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred To Rules |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Rules |