MS SC518 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating Hillcrest Christian School "lady Cougars" Fast Pitch Softball Team And Head Coach Reinaldo Dixon For Their Outstanding 2020 Season And For Winning The Midsouth Association Of Independent Schools (mais) Class Aaaa State Championship.
Title
Commend Hillcrest Christian Girls Fast Pitch Softball Team for MAIS State Championship.
Sponsors
Sen. David Blount [D] | Sen. Juan Barnett [D] | Sen. Mike Thompson [R] | Sen. Bart Williams [R] |
Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] | Sen. Willie Simmons [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-02-11 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-02-11 | House | Immediate Release |
2021-02-11 | House | Adopted |
2021-02-09 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred To Rules |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Adopted |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Referred To Rules |