MS SC517 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on February 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on February 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Extending The Deepest Sympathy Of The Legislature To The Surviving Family Of Former Mississippi Mayor, Politician, Delta Blues Promoter, Entrepreneur, Attorney, Pilot, National Guard Officer, Developer, Preservationist, Actor, Film Producer And Restaurant And Nightclub Impresario William O. "bill" Luckett, Jr., Of Clarksdale, Mississippi.
Title
Extend sympathy of Legislature to surviving family of former Mayor, attorney, and blues promoter Bill Luckett of Clarksdale.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - House - House Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-02-16 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-02-16 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-02-16 | House | Adopted |
2022-02-15 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred To Rules |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Adopted |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Referred To Rules |