MS SC505 | 2018 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-30 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-30 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Extending The Eternal "respect" Of The Legislature For The Life And Accomplishments Of Aretha Franklin, The "queen Of Soul," And Expressing The Condolences Of The Mississippi Legislature To Her Family Upon Her Passing.
Title
Extend the "RESPECT" of the Legislature for the life and contributions of Aretha Franklin, the "Queen of Soul."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-29 - House - House Adopted (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-24 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-24 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-30 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-08-29 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-08-29 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-08-29 | House | Adopted |
2018-08-29 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-08-27 | House | Referred To Rules |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Referred To Rules |