MS SB3214 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-24 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act Entitled The "federal Abortion-mandate Opt-out Act"; To Prohibit The Use Of Federal Funds To Pay For Elective Abortions Covered By Private Insurance In The State Of Mississippi Through A Health Care Exchange; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care exchange plans; prohibit use of federal funds to pay for elective abortions in Mississippi.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 75 N: 32 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-24 Approved by Governor
2010-05-05 Enrolled Bill Signed
2010-05-04 Enrolled Bill Signed
2010-04-28 Transmitted To Senate
2010-04-28 Motion to Reconsider Tabled
2010-04-24 Motion to Reconsider Entered
2010-04-24 Passed
2010-04-24 Title Suff Do Pass
2010-04-23 Referred To Public Health and Human Services
2010-04-23 Transmitted To House
2010-04-23 Immediate Release
2010-04-23 Passed
2010-04-23 Committee Substitute Adopted
2010-04-23 Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2010-04-23 Referred To Appropriations
2010-04-23 Suspend from Deadlines by SC 702

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback