MS SB3204 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Biloxi, Mississippi, To Take Necessary Action To Clean Private Property On Which Commercial Buildings Or Multifamily Housing Building Structures Are, Or Were, Located That Were Impacted By Hurricane Katrina, Are No Long In A State Of Repair Suitable For Use And Occupancy, And Are Neglected To The Extent The Structures Or Debris And Remnants From Structures Are A Menace To Public Health And Safety; To Provide For A Hearing And Notice To Property Owners And Lienholders; To Provide That If The City Takes Corrective Action Regarding The Property, The City May Recover Its Actual Cost And Impose A Penalty; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Biloxi, MS; may clean certain private property that was impacted by Hurricane Katrina.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-23 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-13 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-04-29 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-28 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-23 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-04-23 | Immediate Release | |
2010-04-23 | Passed | |
2010-04-23 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-03-27 | Referred To Local and Private Legislation | |
2010-03-25 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-03-25 | Immediate Release | |
2010-03-25 | Passed | |
2010-03-24 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-03-23 | Referred To Local and Private |