MS SB3186 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Additional Appropriation Of Special Funds To Defray The Expenses Of The District Attorneys And Assistant District Attorneys; The Mississippi State Board Of Chiropractic Examiners; The Mississippi Department Of Finance And Administration; The Mississippi Fair Commission - Dixie National Livestock Show; The Pat Harrison Waterway District; The University Of Mississippi Medical Center; And The State Board For Community And Junior Colleges For Fiscal Year 2010; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Appropriation; State Government Agencies Special Fund; Additional FY 2010.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 100 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 100 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-13 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-04-29 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-28 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-23 | Motion to Reconsider Tabled | |
2010-04-22 | Motion to Reconsider Entered | |
2010-04-21 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-04-21 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-04-21 | Recommitted For Further Conf | |
2010-04-21 | Recommitted For Further Conf | |
2010-04-21 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-04-21 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-25 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 121 | |
2010-03-19 | Conferees Named Stringer,Brown,Sullivan | |
2010-03-17 | Conferees Named Nunnelee,Davis,Hyde-Smith | |
2010-03-17 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2010-03-12 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-03-10 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-10 | Amended | |
2010-03-09 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-03-01 | Referred To Appropriations | |
2010-02-25 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-24 | Passed | |
2010-02-23 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-02-23 | Referred To Appropriations |