MS SB3167 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation Of Capital Expense Funds To Mississippi Department Of Transportation For The Purpose Of Providing Funds To The Emergency Road And Bridge Repair Fund For Fiscal Year 2023.
Title
Capital Expense Funds; FY2023 appropriation to MDOT for the Emergency Road and Bridge Repair Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Died In Committee |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Passed |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |