MS SB3137 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation To Defray The Expenses Of The Mississippi Ethics Commission For The Fiscal Year 2011.
Title
Appropriation; Ethics Comm.
Sponsors
Sen. Doug Davis [R] | Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] | Sen. Alan Nunnelee [R] | Sen. Bill Stone [D] |
Sen. Bennie Turner [D] | Sen. J.P. Wilemon [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 94 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 94 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-12 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-04-29 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-28 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-21 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-04-20 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-04-20 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-25 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 121 | |
2010-03-19 | Conferees Named Stringer,Coleman (29th),Coleman (65th) | |
2010-03-17 | Conferees Named Nunnelee,Turner,Hopson | |
2010-03-17 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2010-03-12 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-03-10 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-10 | Amended | |
2010-03-09 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-02-25 | Referred To Appropriations | |
2010-02-24 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-23 | Passed | |
2010-02-16 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-02-15 | Referred To Appropriations |