MS SB3135 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Vetoed on May 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-05 - Veto Referred To Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-05 - Veto Referred To Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation To Defray The Expenses Of The Department Of Public Safety For Fiscal Year 2011.
Title
Appropriation; Dept. Public Safety - Consol.
Sponsors
Sen. David Blount [D] | Sen. Lydia Chassaniol [R] | Sen. Doug Davis [R] | Sen. Perry Lee [R] |
Sen. Alan Nunnelee [R] | Sen. Willie Simmons [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-22 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 97 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 97 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-05 | Veto Referred To Appropriations | |
2010-05-13 | Partially Vetoed By Governor | |
2010-04-29 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-28 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-23 | Motion to Reconsider Tabled | |
2010-04-23 | Motion to Reconsider Tabled | |
2010-04-22 | Motion to Reconsider Entered | |
2010-04-22 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-04-22 | Motion to Reconsider Entered | |
2010-04-22 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-04-22 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-04-22 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-25 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 121 | |
2010-03-19 | Conferees Named Stringer,Flaggs,Sullivan | |
2010-03-17 | Conferees Named Nunnelee,Lee (35th),Chassaniol | |
2010-03-17 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2010-03-12 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-03-10 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-10 | Amended | |
2010-03-09 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-02-25 | Referred To Appropriations | |
2010-02-24 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-23 | Passed | |
2010-02-16 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-02-15 | Referred To Appropriations |