MS SB3128 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation To The Board Of Trustees Of State Institutions Of Higher Learning For Support Of The Eight Universities' Designated Institutes, Laboratories And Programs For Which They Are Responsible And The Executive Office Of The Board Of Trustees For Fiscal Year 2011; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Appropriation; IHL - General Support - Subsidiary Programs -Consol.
Sponsors
Sen. Doug Davis [R] | Sen. Bob Dearing [D] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] | Sen. Gary Jackson [R] |
Sen. Alan Nunnelee [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 103 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 103 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-13 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-04-29 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-28 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-21 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-04-21 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-25 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 121 | |
2010-03-19 | Conferees Named Stringer,Reynolds,Holland | |
2010-03-17 | Conferees Named Nunnelee,Davis,Jackson (15th) | |
2010-03-17 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2010-03-12 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-03-10 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-10 | Amended | |
2010-03-09 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-02-25 | Referred To Appropriations | |
2010-02-24 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-23 | Passed | |
2010-02-16 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-02-15 | Referred To Appropriations |