MS SB3123 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Clay County, Mississippi, To Expend Up To $50,000.00 To Assist The Institute Of Community Services, Also Known As Head Start, With The Purchase Of A School Bus; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Clay County; authorize to expend up to $50,000.00 to assist ICS (Head Start) with the purchase of a school bus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-28 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-27 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-26 | House | Passed |
2019-03-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-03-22 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |