MS SB3121 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Trustees Of The Simpson County Economic Development District To Convey The Water Tank And Related Water System Currently Existing In The Simpson County Commerce Park On Highway 43, Together With A Utility Easement Through The Park Property, To The City Of Mendenhall, Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Simpson County; economic development district may convey water tank, water system and easement to City of Mendenhall.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-28 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-27 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-26 | House | Passed |
2019-03-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-03-22 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |