MS SB3116 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-01 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-01 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Additional Appropriation To The Department Of Finance And Administration For The Purpose Of Providing Funds To Destination Marketing Organizations To Assist In Paying Costs Of Certain Marketing Activities And Providing Funds To Mississippi Main Street Association For The Period Beginning On The Passage Of This Act And Ending On June 30, 2024.
Title
Appropriation; additional to DFA for destination marketing organizations and Main Street Association, ARPA funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 109 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-01 | Senate | Died In Conference |
2023-03-29 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 61 | |
2023-03-26 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2023-03-26 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2023-03-25 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2023-03-25 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2023-03-17 | House | Conferees Named Read,Oliver,Currie |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Polk,DeBar |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2023-03-10 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2023-03-09 | House | Passed As Amended |
2023-03-09 | House | Amended |
2023-03-07 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Passed |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |