MS SB3088 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Baldwyn, Mississippi, To Expand And Operate Its Natural Gas Distribution System Within A Certain Area Outside The Corporate Limits In Order To Provide Gas Service To Underserved Areas Of Tippah County, Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Baldwyn; authorize to expand and operate natural gas distribution system to serve certain areas of Tippah County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-29 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-03-28 | House | Passed |
2021-03-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-03-28 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Passed |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |