MS SB3070 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 933, Local And Private Laws Of 2015, To Extend The Repeal Date On The Provision Of Law That Authorizes The Establishment Of The Monroe County Beautification Commission; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Monroe County; extend the repeal date on the law that establishes the Monroe County Beautification Commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Hob Bryan [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 110 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-04-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-28 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-03-28 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2018-03-25 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Ladner, Barton, Jackson) |
2018-03-24 | House | Passed |
2018-03-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-03-22 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Passed |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |