MS SB3062 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Conferees Named Read,Cockerham,Huddleston
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act Making An Additional Appropriation Of Capital Expense Funds And Special Funds To Defray The Expenses Of The Department Of Finance And Administration For Fiscal Year 2019; The Department Of Revenue For Fiscal Year 2019; And The Board Of Animal Health For Fiscal Year 2019; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriation; additional appropriations for various state agencies for FY2019.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22HouseConferees Named Read,Cockerham,Huddleston
2019-03-22SenateConferees Named Clarke,Hopson,Tollison
2019-03-20SenateDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2019-03-14HouseReturned For Concurrence
2019-03-13HousePassed As Amended
2019-03-13HouseAmended
2019-03-12HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2019-02-26HouseReferred To Appropriations
2019-02-25SenateTransmitted To House
2019-02-21SenatePassed
2019-02-19SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-02-19SenateReferred To Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback