MS SB3037 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act Making An Appropriation For The Support And Maintenance Of The Mississippi Agricultural And Forestry Experiment Station For Fiscal Year 2012.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriation; IHL - Mississippi State University - Agricultural and Forestry Experiment Station.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 117 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 112 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-26 Approved by Governor
2011-04-06 Enrolled Bill Signed
2011-04-06 Enrolled Bill Signed
2011-04-04 Conference Report Adopted
2011-04-04 Conference Report Adopted
2011-04-04 Conference Report Filed
2011-04-04 Conference Report Filed
2011-03-31 Suspend from Deadlines by HC 145
2011-03-18 Conferees Named Davis,Lee (35th),Jackson (15th)
2011-03-17 Conferees Named Stringer,Ward,Eaton
2011-03-15 Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
2011-02-25 Returned For Concurrence
2011-02-24 Passed As Amended
2011-02-24 Amended
2011-02-24 Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
2011-02-21 Referred To Appropriations
2011-02-18 Transmitted To House
2011-02-17 Passed
2011-02-15 Title Suff Do Pass
2011-02-14 Referred To Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback