MS SB3030 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation To The Mississippi State Board Of Chiropractic Examiners For Fiscal Year 2023.
Title
Appropriation; Chiropractic Examiners, Board of.
Sponsors
Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] | Sen. John Polk [R] | Sen. Albert Butler [D] | Sen. Angela Burks Hill [R] |
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Benjamin Suber [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-03-17 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-16 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-03-15 | House | Passed |
2022-03-10 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Passed |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |