MS SB3009 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation To The Board Of Trustees Of State Institutions Of Higher Learning For The Support And Maintenance Of Financial Aid Scholarship, Loan And Grant Programs And The Mississippi Office Of Student Financial Aid, For Fiscal Year 2023.
Title
Appropriation; IHL - Student Financial Aid.
Sponsors
Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] | Sen. John Polk [R] | Sen. Rita Potts Parks [R] | Sen. Dennis DeBar [R] |
Sen. Willie Simmons [D] | Sen. Bart Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 117 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 117 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-04-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-04-04 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-04-04 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-29 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 89 | |
2022-03-27 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2022-03-27 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2022-03-26 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-26 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Read,Beckett,Bounds |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Parks,DeBar |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-16 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-15 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-15 | House | Amended |
2022-03-10 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Passed |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |