MS SB2998 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The Town Of Sardis, Mississippi, To Levy A Tax Upon The Gross Sales Of Hotels And Motels Derived From Room Rentals And Upon The Gross Proceeds Of Sales Of Restaurants; To Provide That The Revenue From The Tax Shall Be Expended By The Town Of Sardis For The Enhancement Of Tourism And For The Provision Of Parks And Recreation Facilities; To Provide That The Tax Shall Be Collected By The Department Of Revenue And Paid To The Town Of Sardis; To Provide For An Election On Whether The Tax May Be Levied; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Town of Sardis; authorize the levy of a tax on hotel, motel and restaurant sales.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - House Passed (Y: 83 N: 11 NV: 28 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-04-04 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-31 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-03-31 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-03-31 | House | Passed |
2022-03-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-03-17 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Passed |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |