MS SB2996 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Stone County, Mississippi, To Enter Into Contracts For The East Mchenry Road Project Phase Ii That May Extend Beyond 30 Days From The Termination And End Of The Term Of Office Of Such Board; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stone County; authorize contracts to complete East McHenry Road project that may extend beyond the term of board of supervisors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28 Approved by Governor
2019-03-21HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-21SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-18HouseReturned For Enrolling
2019-03-14HousePassed
2019-03-12HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-02-26HouseReferred To Local and Private Legislation
2019-02-26SenateTransmitted To House
2019-02-25SenatePassed
2019-02-20SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-02-13SenateReferred To Local and Private

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback