MS SB2962 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act Making An Additional Appropriation Of Capital Expense Funds, And Special Funds To Defray The Expenses Of The Office Of The Attorney General For Fiscal Years 2023 And 2024; The State Veterans Affairs Board For Fiscal Years 2023 And 2024; The Department Of Public Safety For Fiscal Year 2023; The Department Of Education For Fiscal Year 2023; The Department Of Finance And Administration For Fiscal Years 2023 And 2024; The Department Of Wildlife Fisheries And Parks For Fiscal Year 2023; The State Veterans Home Purchase Board For Fiscal Year 2023; The Board Of Animal Health For Fiscal Year 2023; The Administrative Office Of Courts For Fiscal Year 2023; East Central Community College For Fiscal Year 2023; Hinds Community College For Fiscal Year 2023; Mississippi Board Of Registered Professional Geologists For Fiscal Year 2023; Mississippi Department Of Information Technology Services For Fiscal Years 2023 And 2024.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriation; additional appropriations for various state agencies for FY2023 and FY2024.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-16 - House - House Passed (Y: 98 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-27 Approved by Governor
2023-02-21HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2023-02-21SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2023-02-16HouseReturned For Enrolling
2023-02-16HouseImmediate Release
2023-02-16HousePassed
2023-02-16HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2023-02-14HouseReferred To Appropriations
2023-02-14SenateTransmitted To House
2023-02-09SenatePassed As Amended
2023-02-09SenateAmended
2023-02-08SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2023-02-08SenateReferred To Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback