MS SB2960 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-03 - Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-03 - Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-7-203, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delete The Disqualification Of A Municipal Employee From Being Appointed To The Board Of Trustees Of The Municipal Separate School District Within Which He Or She Is Employed; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Municipal separate school board; remove disqualification of municipal employee from serving on board.
Sponsors
Sen. Ezell Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-03 - House - House Failed (Y: 51 N: 64 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-01-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-03 | Failed | |
2010-02-03 | Amendment Failed | |
2010-02-02 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-01-29 | Referred To Education | |
2010-01-27 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-01-27 | Immediate Release | |
2010-01-27 | Passed | |
2010-01-26 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-18 | Referred To Education |