MS SB2941 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Reenact And Amend Chapter 944, Local And Private Laws Of 2010, As Amended By Chapter 949, Local And Private Laws Of 2012, To Extend Until July 1, 2021, The Repeal On The Law That Authorizes The Town Of Byhalia, Mississippi, To Impose A Tax Upon The Gross Proceeds Of Room Rentals For Hotels Or Motels In The Town; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Town of Byhalia; reenact hotel and motel tax and extend repeal date until July 1, 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 100 N: 11 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-03-16 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-15 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-03-14 | House | Passed |
2017-02-21 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-02-20 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Passed |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |