MS SB2918 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 61-13-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For The Procurement Of Aircraft, Aircraft Maintenance, Parts, Equipment And Services; To Provide That It Shall Be The Responsibility Of The Executive Director Of The Department Of Finance And Administration To Ensure Commercially Reasonable Practices For Such Procurement; To Amend Section 27-104-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Previous Section; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State aircraft; Director of DFA shall ensure commercially reasonable procurement practices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15 Approved by Governor
2019-03-11HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-11SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-07HouseReturned For Enrolling
2019-03-07HouseMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2019-03-06HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Bell (21st), Read, Huddleston)
2019-03-06HousePassed
2019-02-27HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-02-21HouseReferred To Appropriations
2019-02-07SenateTransmitted To House
2019-02-06SenatePassed
2019-02-05SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-21SenateReferred To Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback