MS SB2868 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 97-5-39, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Knowing Solicitation Of A Child To Violate The Uniform Controlled Substance Law Or To Participate In Gangs Or Gang-related Activities Constitutes Contributing To The Delinquency Of A Minor; To Amend Section 97-44-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Short Title Of The Mississippi Streetgang Act; To Amend Section 97-44-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Definitions; To Amend Section 97-44-19, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Penalties For Criminal Gang Activity; To Create Section 97-44-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Recodify The Existing Evidentiary Standards For Prosecution Under This Act; To Amend Section 97-3-2, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Definition Of Violent Crime To Include Violations Of The Mississippi Gang Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Delinquency of a minor; provide that those who cause minors to sell drugs or join gangs contribute to.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | House | Died In Committee |
2018-02-22 | House | DR - TSDPAA: JB To YF |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred To Judiciary B;Youth and Family Affairs |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Passed |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Amendment Failed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Tabled Subject To Call |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |