MS SB2859 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 47-5-401 And 47-5-451, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Mississippi Department Of Corrections To Establish Standards That Must Be Satisfied For A County To Receive State Offenders For Public Service Work Programs And Joint State-county Work Programs; To Require The Department To Publish These Standards On Its Website; To Provide That The Department Shall Respond To A County's Request For State Offenders For These Programs Within 60 Days; To Bring Forward Sections 47-5-931 And 47-5-933, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provide For The Housing Of Offenders In Regional Correctional Facilities, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Offender Community Work Programs; require MDOC transparency in approving counties for participation in.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | House | Died In Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred To Corrections |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Amended |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Corrections |