MS SB2854 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Charleston, Mississippi, To Levy A Tax Upon The Gross Proceeds Of Sales Of Restaurants For The Purpose Of Providing Funds For The Promotion Of Tourism And Parks And Recreation; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Charleston; authorize a tax on restaurants to provide funds for tourism and parks and recreation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 97 N: 4 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-11 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-07 | House | Passed |
2019-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Passed |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |