MS SB2847 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 41-115-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit The Use Of Tanning Devices At Tanning Facilities By Children Under Age 18; To Assess A Civil Penalty For Violations Of This Section; To Require Tanning Facilities To Post A Notice Developed By The Mississippi State Department Of Health Stating It Is Unlawful For A Tanning Facility Owner Or Operator To Allow A Person Under The Age Of 18 To Use Any Tanning Device; To Require Tanning Facilities To Post A Notice Developed By The Mississippi State Department Of Health Stating That A Tanning Facility Or Operator That Violates This Section Is Subject To A Civil Penalty; To Require Tanning Facilities To Post A Notice Developed By The Mississippi State Department Of Health Stating That An Individual May Report Violations Of This Section To The Mississippi State Department Of Health Stating The Health Risks Associated With Tanning; To Require The Operator To Require Photo Identification Indicating That The Person Using A Tanning Device Is At Least 18 Years Of Age; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tanning facility regulation; prohibit use by anyone under 18 years of age.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 34 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05HouseDied In Committee
2019-02-21HouseReferred To Public Health and Human Services
2019-02-14SenateTransmitted To House
2019-02-13SenatePassed
2019-02-13SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2019-02-05SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2019-01-21SenateReferred To Public Health and Welfare

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback