MS SB2831 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Establish The Insurance Data Security Law; To Provide The Purpose And Intent Of The Act; To Define Certain Terms Used In The Act; To Require Insurance Licensees In This State To Develop, Implement And Maintain An Information Security Program; To Require Certain Investigation Of A Cybersecurity Event; To Require Certain Notification Of A Cybersecurity Event; To Provide For Certain Confidentiality; To Provide Exceptions To The Act; To Provide For Penalties For Violations Of The Act; To Provide The Commissioner Of Insurance With Regulatory Powers Necessary To Carry Out The Act; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance Data Security Law; create.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 112 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03 Approved by Governor
2019-03-27HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-27SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-20SenateConcurred in Amend From House
2019-03-14HouseReturned For Concurrence
2019-03-13HousePassed As Amended
2019-03-13HouseAmended
2019-03-12HouseRead the Third Time
2019-03-05HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2019-03-05HouseDR - TSDPAA: AP To IN
2019-02-26HouseDR - TSDPAA: IN To AP
2019-02-20HouseReferred To Insurance;Appropriations
2019-02-07SenateTransmitted To House
2019-02-06SenatePassed
2019-02-06SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2019-01-31SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2019-01-30SenateDR - TSDPCS: IN To AP
2019-01-21SenateReferred To Insurance;Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback