MS SB2827 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 31-7-13.2, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Construction Management At Risk Method Of Project Delivery; To Provide That For The Purposes Of A Qualifications-based Selection Procedure, A Contract For Construction Management At Risk Services Shall Be Treated The Same As A Contract For Architectural, Engineering And Land Surveying Services; To Provide That The Construction Manager Selected By An Agency Or Governing Authority To Provide Construction Management At Risk Services Shall Solicit Bids For Construction On The Project As Provided In The Public Purchasing Law; To Provide That The Construction Manager May Prequalify Vendors And Contractors With Certain Qualifications Before Soliciting Any Bids Or Entering Into Any Contracts; To Provide That A Bidder's Confidential And Proprietary Information Shall Not Be Disclosed To Anyone Outside Of The Agency, Governing Authority Or Construction Manager Without The Bidder's Prior Written Consent; To Bring Forward Section 25-61-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For The Purpose Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Public purchases; specify prequalification process for construction manager at risk soliciting bids for projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-05 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2021-03-10 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed As Amended |
2021-03-09 | House | Amended |
2021-03-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred To Workforce Development |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 61 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 7 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |